Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021053802 | ![]() | 25.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313963993 | 09.08.2013 | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US202016949717 | 11.11.2020 | US201514665886 | 23.03.2015 | US201916417442 | 20.05.2019 | US201113165287 | 21.06.2011 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8985353 | ![]() | 24.03.2015 | B2 | US2013319964 | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313963993 | 09.08.2013 | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US201113165287 | 21.06.2011 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8827092 | ![]() | 09.09.2014 | B2 | US2013153525 | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US201313752053 | 28.01.2013 | US201113165287 | 21.06.2011 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8511489 | ![]() | 20.08.2013 | B2 | US2011247992 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US201113165287 | 21.06.2011 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7967158 | ![]() | 28.06.2011 | B2 | US2008203045 | 28.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7546928 | ![]() | 16.06.2009 | B2 | US2008099421 | 01.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12187587 | ![]() | 07.01.2025 | B2 | US2024124276 | 18.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318532256 | 07.12.2023 | US201313963993 | 09.08.2013 | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US202016949717 | 11.11.2020 | US202117496106 | 07.10.2021 | US201514665886 | 23.03.2015 | US201916417442 | 20.05.2019 | US201113165287 | 21.06.2011 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11884522 | ![]() | 30.01.2024 | B2 | US2022024732 | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313963993 | 09.08.2013 | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US202016949717 | 11.11.2020 | US202117496106 | 07.10.2021 | US201514665886 | 23.03.2015 | US201916417442 | 20.05.2019 | US201113165287 | 21.06.2011 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10865079 | ![]() | 15.12.2020 | B2 | US2019270623 | 05.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313963993 | 09.08.2013 | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US201514665886 | 23.03.2015 | US201916417442 | 20.05.2019 | US201113165287 | 21.06.2011 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10336589 | ![]() | 02.07.2019 | B2 | US2015251882 | 10.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313963993 | 09.08.2013 | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US201514665886 | 23.03.2015 | US201113165287 | 21.06.2011 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080091706 | ![]() | 14.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080038034 | ![]() | 02.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5276867B | ![]() | 28.08.2013 | B2 | JP2009007164 | 15.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5297624B | ![]() | 25.09.2013 | B2 | JP2008110877 | 15.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3106420 | ![]() | 06.06.2018 | B1 | EP3106420 | 21.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14183968 | 01.04.2008 | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | EP13153486 | 01.04.2008 | EP08251277 | 01.04.2008 | EP07254071 | 15.10.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2829500 | ![]() | 08.06.2016 | B1 | EP2829500 | 18.03.2015 | A3 | EP2829500 | 28.01.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP14183968 | 01.04.2008 | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | EP13153486 | 01.04.2008 | EP08251277 | 01.04.2008 | EP07254071 | 15.10.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2597066 | ![]() | 09.12.2020 | B1 | EP2597066 | 29.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | EP07254071 | 15.10.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2589565 | ![]() | 10.09.2014 | B1 | EP2589565 | 08.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | EP13153486 | 01.04.2008 | EP08251277 | 01.04.2008 | EP07254071 | 15.10.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2589564 | ![]() | 15.03.2017 | B1 | EP2589564 | 08.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | EP07254071 | 15.10.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2589563 | ![]() | 08.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | EP07254071 | 15.10.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1916220 | ![]() | 27.07.2016 | B1 | EP1916220 | 30.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1990306 | ![]() | 06.11.2013 | B1 | EP1990306 | 03.12.2008 | A3 | EP1990306 | 12.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | EP08251277 | 01.04.2008 | EP07254071 | 15.10.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0704004 | 15.07.2008 | C1 | BRPI0704004 | 10.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101254888B | 05.09.2012 | B | CN101254888 | 03.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101311102B | 09.03.2011 | B | CN101311102 | 26.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102092644 | 15.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102862921 | 09.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN2447CHE2014 | 03.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007013265 | 19.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008004549 | 30.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2464221 | 20.10.2012 | C2 | RU2007139810 | 10.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73310407 | 09.04.2007 | US86326506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2467946 | 27.11.2012 | C2 | RU2008114296 | 20.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US2390208 | 31.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | EP2589565 | EP2829500 | EP3106420 |