Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
10.07.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.07.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
12.11.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |