EP1998382 - Light source module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foxsemicon Integrated Technology, Inc. No. 16, Ke-Jung Road Science-Based Industrial Park Chu-Nan, Miao-Li Hsien Taiwan 350 / TW | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Yuan-Fa c/o Foxsemicon Integrated Technology, Inc. No. 16, Ke-Jung Rd Science-Based Industrial Park Chu-Nan Miao-Li Hsien Taiwain 350 / TW | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Stuttard, Garry Philip Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08251771.5 | 21.05.2008 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | CN20071074695 | 01.06.2007 Original published format: CN200710074695 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1998382 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
F21V29/54 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lichtquellenmodul | [2008/49] | English: | Light source module | [2008/49] | French: | Module de source lumineuse | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3212592 (PHILIPS KOMMUNIKATIONS IND AG [DE]) [Y] 5,7-9 * page 5, lines 6-23; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5895964 (NAKAYAMA KAZUAKI [JP]) [Y] 4 * column 3, lines 38-41; figure 4 *; | [Y]WO0215288 (POWER SIGNAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 10,11 * abstract ** page 8, lines 12-18 *; | [Y]US2003058616 (WONG HENRY [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0018]; figure 2 *; | [XY]US2004113549 (ROBERTS JOHN K [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12 * paragraphs [0058] , [0067] , [0072] , [0077]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 4-11 |