EP1997730 - Wing debris detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mackin, Steve G. 12230 N.E. 32nd Street Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/49] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08251887.9 | 30.05.2008 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | US20070756423 | 31.05.2007 Original published format: US 756423 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1997730 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1997730 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1997730 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B64C9/20, B64D15/20, B64D45/00 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
B64C9/20 (EP,US);
B64D15/20 (EP,US);
Y02T50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Title | German: | Detektor für Ablagerungen auf einem Flügel | [2008/49] | English: | Wing debris detector | [2008/49] | French: | Détecteur de dépôts sur une aile | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 27.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2008 | AT | 30.05.2012 | BE | 30.05.2012 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | DK | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | FI | 30.05.2012 | HR | 30.05.2012 | IE | 30.05.2012 | IT | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LU | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | MT | 30.05.2012 | NL | 30.05.2012 | PL | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SE | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | NO | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | ES | 10.09.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LU | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | |
NO | 30.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5621400 (CORBI RONALD W [US]) [A] 1,5,6,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2171450 (WINSMORE LANGLEY THOMAS) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |