EP2000907 - Supplying applications to mobile devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states weComm Ltd Augustine House 6a Austin Friars London EC2N 2HA / GB | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jowett, Frederick Haigh 26 Jansen Walk London SW11 2AZ / GB | 02 /
Noble, Robert Jeffrey 8 Cell Barnes Lane St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 5RA / GB | [2009/17] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
Jowett, Frederick Haigh 26 Jansen Walk London SW11 2AZ / GB | ||
02 /
Russell, Peter George Fisher 6 Corinthian Close Hatch Warren Basingstoke RG22 4TN / GB | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 37-41 Gower Street London WC1E 6HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08251927.3 | 03.06.2008 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | GB20070011186 | 09.06.2007 Original published format: GB 0711186 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2000907 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2000907 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F9/44 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,GB,US);
H04L67/00 (US);
G06F8/61 (EP,GB,US);
H04L67/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | Bereitstellung von Anwendungen für mobile Vorrichtungen | [2008/50] | English: | Supplying applications to mobile devices | [2008/50] | French: | Fourniture d'applications à des dispositifs mobiles | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 15.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/42] | 02.06.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6023714 (HILL WILLIAM [US], et al); | [X]WO03067427 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al); | [X]US2003184585 (LIN GEORGE [US], et al); | [X]GB2420887 (OMNIFONE LTD [GB]) |