EP2040418 - Program control method for network devices and network system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukui, Daisuke c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Ioku, Akira c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Maeoka, Jun c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2012/06] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
Fukui, Daisuke c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Ioku, Akira c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Maeoka, Jun c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252549.4 | 25.07.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | JP20070244639 | 21.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007244639 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2040418 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2040418 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
H04L12/2814 (EP,US);
G06F8/65 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/59 (EP,US);
H04L12/2821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Extension states | AL | 13.08.2008 | BA | 13.08.2008 | MK | 13.08.2008 | RS | 13.08.2008 | Title | German: | Programmsteuerverfahren für Netzwerkgeräte und Netzwerksystem | [2009/13] | English: | Program control method for network devices and network system | [2009/13] | French: | Procédé de contrôle de programme pour dispositifs de réseau et système de réseau | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2008 | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | HR | 08.02.2012 | IT | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | NO | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | IE | 25.07.2012 | LU | 25.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 25.07.2012 | ||
LU | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NO | 08.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003007505 (NODA TAKURO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0153] *; | [XY]US2004221207 (YOKOTA DAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0095] * * figures 7,11 * [Y] 3,4,7; | [A]WO2006112662 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1,4,7 * paragraph [0029] * * figures 3a,6a,6b,7 *; | [Y]WO2007004754 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 3,4,7 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0136] * * paragraphs [0158] , [0172] * * figures 2,4 * | by applicant | JP2005309617 | JP2006243915 | JP2006260425 |