EP2031186 - Turbine engine blade cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gayman, Scott W. 33 Elro Street Manchester, CT 06040 / US | 02 /
Piggush, Justin D. 200 Beacon Street Hartford, CT 06105 / US | 03 /
Pietraszkiewicz, Edward F. 1094 Pleasant Street Southington, CT 06489 / US | 04 /
Agli, William A., III 2803 Riverside Drive - 5105 Grand Prairie, Texas 75050 / US | [2009/12] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
Gayman, Scott W. 33 Elro Street Manchester, CT 06040 / US | ||
02 /
Piggush, Justin D. 200 Beacon Street Hartford, CT 06105 / US | |||
03 /
Pietraszkiewicz, Edward F. 1094 Pleasant Street Southington, CT 06489 / US | |||
04 /
Agli, William A., III 2803 Riverside Drive Grand Prairie, Texas 75050 / US | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252810.0 | 22.08.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | US20070845418 | 27.08.2007 Original published format: US 845418 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2031186 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2031186 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031186 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D5/20, F01D5/28 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
F05D2300/611 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49336 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | F01D5/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2012/29] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlsystem für eine Gasturbinenschaufel | [2009/10] | English: | Turbine engine blade cooling | [2009/10] | French: | Agencement de refroidissement d'une aube d'une turbine à gaz | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 09.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1422383 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5-10,15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004]; figure 3A * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068] *; | [XY]US5733102 (LEE CHING-PANG [US], et al) [X] 11,12 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 20 * * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 40; figure 3 * [Y] 1-3,5-10; | [XY]EP1091090 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 11,13,14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0089] * [Y] 15; | [X]US2005084657 (OHARA MINORU [JP]) [X] 11,13,14 * paragraph [0081]; figures 13A-13F * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0094] *; | [A]GB2075129 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1422383 | EP1090090 |