EP2159991 - Accessing a content distribution network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252819.1 | 26.08.2008 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2159991 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
H04L67/1021 (EP);
H04L67/1001 (EP);
H04L67/1034 (EP);
H04L69/40 (EP);
H04L61/4511 (EP);
H04L67/563 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zugriff auf ein Inhaltsverteilungsnetzwerk | [2010/09] | English: | Accessing a content distribution network | [2010/09] | French: | Accès à un réseau de distribution de contenu | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006072114 (LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * abstract * [Y] 2-5,7-10; | [Y]US2007006270 (FRIGUI IMED [CA], et al) [Y] 4,5,9,10* page 3, column L, line 1 - page 3, column L, line 27 *; | [Y] - RAJKUMAR BUYYA ET AL, "A Case for Peering of Content Delivery Networks", IEEE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS ONLINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20061001), vol. 7, no. 10, ISSN 1541-4922, pages 3 - 3, XP011143172 [Y] 2,3,7,8 * abstract * |