EP2160936 - Agricultural implement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kelly, Shane P.O. Box 200 Booleroo Center, South Australia 5482 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Kelly, Shane Kelly Engineering P.O. Box 200 Booleroo Center, South Australia 5482 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Instone, Terry, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [2011/38] |
Former [2010/10] | Instone, Terry, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252964.5 | 05.09.2008 | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2160936 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2160936 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01B21/08 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
A01B21/08 (EP);
A01B23/06 (EP);
A01B73/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliches Gerät | [2010/10] | English: | Agricultural implement | [2010/10] | French: | Outil agricole | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 27.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2008 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | HR | 11.01.2012 | IT | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | MT | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | NO | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | ES | 22.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | LU | 05.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
LU | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3327787 (ADEE RAYMOND A) [Y] 4* figure 1 *; | [YD]SU745395 (TARANIN VIKTOR [SU]) [YD] 1-6,10,13 * the whole document *; | [Y]AU611638B (CLYDE IND LTD) [Y] 1-6,10,13 * page 6; figure 1 * | by applicant | SU745395 | SU982551 | SU1523061 | US4893682 |