EP2166451 - Distributed data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Nash, Roger William, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Nash, Roger William, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252968.6 | 08.09.2008 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2166451 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, H04L29/08 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
G06F9/505 (EP);
H04L67/1001 (EP);
H04L67/1023 (EP);
H04L67/567 (EP);
G06F2209/5019 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verteiltes Datenverarbeitungssystem | [2010/12] | English: | Distributed data processing system | [2010/12] | French: | Système distribué de traitement de données | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/34] | 11.04.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6748414 (BOURNAS REDHA M [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * column 6, line 9 - line 28; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP1612674 (TNO [NL]) [Y] 3-9,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * tables 1-3 * * page 7, line 16 - line 25 * * table 6 *; | [A]EP1613109 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0021] ** paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figure 2 *; | [XY] - C MUSCIANO, B KENNEDY, HTML The Definitive Guide, SEBASTOPOL, CALIF., USA, O'REILLY, (199808), XP002508958 [X] 1,2,10,12-15 * Section 1.2.2 The Flow of Information; page 6 - page 7 * * page 129, paragraph L * * Section 5.2.6.1 The src attribute; page 133 * [Y] 3-9,11 |