Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.07.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
26.03.2010 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
19.02.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |