Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010026362 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08252968 | 08.09.2008 | GB0816476 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9015227 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2015 | B2 | US2011167112 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02067 | 24.08.2009 | EP08252968 | 08.09.2008 | GB0816476 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2335154 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2018 | B1 | EP2335154 | 22.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02067 | 24.08.2009 | EP08252968 | 08.09.2008 | EP09785002 | 24.08.2009 | GB0816476 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102144220B | 07.01.2015 | B | CN102144220 | 03.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02067 | 24.08.2009 | EP08252968 | 08.09.2008 | GB0816476 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0816476D0 | 15.10.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0816476 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2166451 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08252968 | 08.09.2008 |