EP2068342 - Plasma display panel and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Setoguchi, Noriaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Sawa, Masahiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Yuji c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2009/24] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252997.5 | 11.09.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | JP20070315583 | 06.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007315583 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2068342 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2068342 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/49 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/34 (KR);
H01J11/22 (KR);
H01J11/24 (EP,US);
H01J11/44 (EP,US);
H01J2211/444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigetafel und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2009/24] | English: | Plasma display panel and method of manufacturing the same | [2009/24] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à plasma et son procédé de fabrication | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 01.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002063510 (YURA SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0079] , [0089] *; | [Y]EP1589556 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0031] *; | [A]JP2005019008 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 2,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] *; | [A]JP2000348627 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP1351270 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5,9 * paragraph [0062]; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | JP2000082395 | JP2002075229 |