EP2037665 - Communication device communication system control method and storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okado, Hiroshi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253009.8 | 12.09.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | JP20070240019 | 14.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007240019 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037665 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2037665 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
H04M11/062 (EP,KR,US);
H04M11/007 (KR);
H04M3/304 (EP,KR,US);
H04M3/34 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, PT [2010/49] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationsvorrichtung, Steuerverfahren für ein Kommunikationssystem und Speichermedium | [2009/12] | English: | Communication device communication system control method and storage medium | [2009/12] | French: | Dispositif de communication, système de communication, procédé de contrôle et support d'enregistrement | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/33] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007189464 (SCHMITT JEAN [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0099] *; | [A]WO0245383 (ESION NETWORKS INC [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 22, line 17 - line 33 *; | [A]WO2007036165 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2007240019 | JP2003018319 | JP2005184389 | JP2000500948 | JP2006033379 |