EP2042403 - Linkable dolly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rehrig Pacific Company 4010 East 26th Street Los Angeles, CA 90058 / US | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meers, Ryan C. 1248 Barry Avenue Nr.4 Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | 02 /
Baltz, Kyle L. 2110 Harriman Lane, Unit B Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | Chave, Lynne Fiona, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253172.4 | 29.09.2008 | [2009/14] | Priority number, date | US20070975810P | 27.09.2007 Original published format: US 975810 P | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2042403 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2042403 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/02 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B62B3/02 (EP,US);
B62B3/16 (EP,US);
B62B2207/02 (EP,US);
B62B3/1476 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/22] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Koppelbarer Rollwagen | [2009/14] | English: | Linkable dolly | [2009/14] | French: | Chariot pouvant être relié | [2009/14] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/04] | 18.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1125818 (LIN PAC MOULDINGS [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * paragraph [0027] * * abstract *; | [X]GB2377689 (PAXTON C G LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,10-13,15 * page 7, paragraph 4 * * abstract *; | [XA]US2004195803 (BROWN EDMUND W [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-9; | [XA]DE19649982 (HINZ FABRIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-9 | by applicant | US20070975810 |