|
29.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
16.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.02.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |