30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
31.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
23.08.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
19.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.08.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.06.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
31.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
20.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
13.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
27.01.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.11.2012 |
First examination report |
|
13.11.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.02.2010 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
13.11.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
10.11.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.10.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
01.10.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.04.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
06.03.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |