Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8243121 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2012 | B2 | US2009091654 | 09.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007262505 | 05.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4932660B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2012 | B2 | JP2009094726 | 30.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007262505 | 05.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2046020 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2019 | B1 | EP2046020 | 08.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007262505 | 05.10.2007 |