EP2046020 - Image recording apparatus and image recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Satoshi c/o Fujifilm Corporation 6, Matsuzakadaira 1-chome Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gu Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Mikio c/o Fujifilm Corporation 6, Matsuzakadaira 1-chome Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gu Miyagi / JP | 03 /
Miyake, Izumi c/o Fujifilm Corporation Tokyo Midtown 7-3, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Okamoto, Satoru c/o Fujifilm Corporation 6, Matsuzakadaira 1-chome Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gu Miyagi / JP | [2019/39] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
Nakamura, Satoshi c/o Fujifilm Corporation 6, Matsuzakadaira 1-chome Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gu Miyagi / JP | ||
02 /
Watanabe, Mikio c/o Fujifilm Corporation 6, Matsuzakadaira 1-chome Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gu Miyagi / JP | |||
03 /
Miyake, Izumi c/o Fujifilm Corporation Tokyo Midtown 7-3, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Okamoto, Satoru c/o Fujifilm Corporation 6, Matsuzakadaira 1-chome Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gu Miyagi / JP | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2019/39] |
Former [2009/15] | Stevens, Jason Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253226.8 | 03.10.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | JP20070262505 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007262505 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2046020 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2046020 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/289, H04N1/21, H04N5/232, H04N5/765, H04N5/77, H04N5/91, H04N9/82, H04N101/00, H04N13/189, H04N13/00, H04N9/79 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
H04N1/2166 (EP,US);
H04N23/698 (EP,US);
H04N1/2187 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/289 (EP,US);
H04N23/63 (EP,US);
H04N5/772 (EP,US);
H04N2013/0088 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3254 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/91 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/15] | H04N5/232, H04N5/77 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/39] |
Former [2009/51] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildaufzeichnungsvorrichtung und Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren | [2009/15] | English: | Image recording apparatus and image recording method | [2009/15] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'enregistrement d'image | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 09.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.11.2019 | GB | 25.12.2019 | [2020/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6507358 (MORI KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 8-11,13 * column 3, lines 26-30 * * column 3, lines 44-60 * * column 13, lines 33-66 * * column 14, lines 25-46 * * column 17, lines 12-20 *; | [X]JP2004320614 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1,8,12,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0018] , [0028] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0040] ** paragraphs [0043] - [0045] *; | [X]EP1519263 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7,12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0068] , [0069] * * paragraphs [0085] - [0087] * * paragraphs [0094] , [0095] * * paragraphs [0098] - [0101] * * paragraphs [0147] , [0159] * | Examination | US2005243187 | by applicant | JP2000101916 | JP2005245018 | JP2005311789 | JP2006121229 |