EP2044877 - Washing appliance with multiple source wash aid pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 N. M 63 Benton Harbor, 49022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 N M-63 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feddema, Mark S. 5278 Heathrow Kalamazoo Michigan 49009 / US | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253231.8 | 03.10.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | US20070867754 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: US 867754 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044877 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/44, D06F39/02, F16K11/02 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A47L15/4418 (EP,US);
A47L15/4481 (EP,US);
D06F39/022 (EP,US);
D06F33/37 (EP,US);
D06F89/026 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/51] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Waschgerät mit Mehrquellen-Waschhilfepumpe | [2009/15] | English: | Washing appliance with multiple source wash aid pump | [2009/15] | French: | Machine à laver doté d'une pompe d'aide au lavage avec des sources multiples | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 09.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 03.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA861941 (OUELLETTE PHILLIP E) [Y] 6-8 * figures 1-4 *; | [XY]FR2244859 (THOMSON BRANDT [FR]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 33; figure 4 * [Y] 6-8; | [X]FR2517375 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6035472 (BARBE DAVID J [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6240585 (PRAECHTER ROY A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0220893 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]US6434772 (BARBE DAVID J [US]) [X] 1-4,10 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 47; figure 1 *; | [X]US2005000551 (MCINTYRE CARRIE LILLEY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 4, paragraph 49 - page 5, paragraph 53; figure 12 *; | [PX]DE102006026800 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [PX] 1-5,9,10 * figure 4a * | Examination | DE959822 |