EP2050928 - Method and apparatus for hole crack removal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Velez, Ramon M. 49 Green Manor Avenue Windsor, CT 06095 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253279.7 | 08.10.2008 | [2009/17] | Priority number, date | US20070872170 | 15.10.2007 Original published format: US 872170 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2050928 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/00, F01D25/28, B23Q3/06, B25B5/14 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
F01D5/005 (EP,US);
F01D25/285 (EP,US);
F05D2230/80 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49238 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49998 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53961 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Loch-/Rissentfernung | [2009/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for hole crack removal | [2009/17] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la suppression de craquelures et de trous | [2009/17] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |