EP2082692 - A method for deploying a device for gastric volume reduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crainich, Lawrence 264 Ceda Road Charlestown, New Hampshire 03603 / US | 02 /
Zeiner, Mark S. 5897 Trailside Court Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 03 /
Harris, Jason L. 3896 Top Flite Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 04 /
Stokes, Michael J. 8 Sleepy Hollow Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45244 / US | 05 /
Alesi, Daniel 2492 Manistique Lakes Drive Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253556.8 | 30.10.2008 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | US20070930281 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: US 930281 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2082692 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2082692 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/068 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/0467 (EP,US);
A61B17/0487 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00818 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0417 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0419 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0475 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0496 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06052 (EP,US);
A61F5/0086 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anwenden einer Vorrichtung bei der Magenverkleinerung | [2009/31] | English: | A method for deploying a device for gastric volume reduction | [2009/31] | French: | Procédé de déploiement d'un dispositif pour la réduction du volume gastrique | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 07.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | by applicant | US20140007793 |