EP2065434 - Polyacetal resin molded article having excellent acid resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 18-1, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8280 / JP | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bessho, Minoru Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973, Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Shimoda, Akihide Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973, Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Peel, James Peter Barker Brettell LLP First Floor, Atrium Court 15-17 Jockey's Fields London WC1R 4QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Peel, James Peter Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253816.6 | 26.11.2008 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | JP20070308537 | 29.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007308537 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2065434 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2065434 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/098, C08K5/13, C08L59/04 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
C08K5/005 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/005, C08L59/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/098, C08L59/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/36] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Formteil aus Polyacetal-Kunststoff mit hervorragender Säurebeständigkeit | [2009/23] | English: | Polyacetal resin molded article having excellent acid resistance | [2009/23] | French: | Article moulé en résine de polyacétal ayant une excellente résistance à l'acide | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]JPH07228751 (POLYPLASTICS CO) [T] 5* paragraphs [0014] - [0015]; table 1 *; | [T]US6506850 (TANIMURA NORITAKA [JP], et al) [T] 5 * the whole document *; | [XI]KR20030048733 (KOLON INC [KR]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * examples 1-8; claim 3; table 1 * [I] 5,6; | [XI]EP1706456 (KOREA ENG PLASTICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * examples 1-3; tables 1,2 * [I] 5 |