EP2071524 - Security system and method for security certification thereof and smart card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/25] | Security system and method for security certification thereof, method of generating relative character information, terminal system, and smart card | ||
[2012/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jang, Won-Churl 114-206, Sindong-a Apt. Banghak 3-dong Dobong-gu Seoul / KR | [2012/19] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Jang, Won-Churi 114-206, Sindong-a Apt. Banghak 3-dong Dobong-gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08254001.4 | 12.12.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | KR20070130982 | 14.12.2007 Original published format: KR 20070130982 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2071524 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2071524 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G06F21/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G06F18/00 (KR);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06K19/07 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/08] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitssystem und Verfahren zur Sicherheitszertifizierung dieses Systems und Chipkarte | [2012/02] | English: | Security system and method for security certification thereof and smart card | [2012/02] | French: | Système de sécurité et procédé pour sa certification de sécurité et carte intelligente | [2012/02] |
Former [2009/25] | Sicherheitssystem und Verfahren zur Sicherheitszertifizierung dieses Systems, Verfahren zum Erzeugen relativer Zeicheninformationen, Endgerätesystem und Chipkarte | ||
Former [2009/25] | Security system and method for security certification thereof, method of generating relative character information, terminal system, and smart card | ||
Former [2009/25] | Système de sécurité et procédé pour sa certification de sécurité, procédé de génération d'informations de caractère relatives, système terminal et carte intelligente | Examination procedure | 15.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 18.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1693774 (HITACHI OMRON TERMINAL SOLU [JP]) [A] 1-37 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0018] , [0019] , [0022] , [0026] - [0028] - [0035] - [0041] - [0045] , [0046] , [0053] , [0058] *; | [A]US2006205497 (WELLS WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] *; | [A]EP1715443 (HITACHI OMRON TERMINAL SOLU [JP]) [A] 1,15,24,25,33 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] *; | [T]JP2006331442 (HITACHI OMRON TERMINAL SOLU); | [T]FR2888065 (SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE [FR]) [T] * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1693774 |