EP2082804 - Hybrid organic-inorganic materials that contain stabilized carbene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Claude Bernard Lyon 1 43 boulevard du 11 novembre 1918 69622 Villeurbanne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Universite Claude Bernard Lyon 1 43 boulevard du 11 novembre 1918 69622 Villeurbanne / FR | ||
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states L'Universite Claude Bernard 6 Lyon 1 43 boulevard du 11 novembre 1918 69622 Villeurbanne / FR | ||
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states CPE Lyon Formation Continue et Recherche 43, boulevard du 11 novembre 1918 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thieuleux, Chloé 3 rue Georges Courteline FR-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
Coperet, Christophe 14 rue Rabelais FR-69003 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Veyre, Laurent 6 Voie de l'Europe FR-38200 Jardin / FR | 04 /
Basset, Jean-Marie 18 Chemin J.B.Gilliard 69300 Caluire et Cuire / FR | 05 /
Camus, Jean-Michel Les Hauts de Mourenx-Bat. B FR-64150 Mourenx / FR | 06 /
Maishal, Tarun 163A Cours Emile Zola FR-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 07 /
Ezzeddine Karame, Iyad Ain-Zhalta Chouf / LB | 08 /
Boualleg, Malika 19 rue C. Michut FR-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 09 /
Corriu, Robert 246 rue de l'Esperou FR-34080 Montpellier / FR | 10 /
Reye, Catherine Résidence le Bussy d'Amboise 160 rue d'Alco FR-34080 Montpellier / FR | 11 /
Mehdi, Ahmad Le Patio du Plan 45 rue de l'Hortus FR-34080 Montpellier / FR | 12 /
Alauzun, Johan L'Ardide Haute Route de Maureilhan FR-34500 Beziers / FR | [2011/52] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
Thieuleux, Chloé 3 rue Georges Courteline FR-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | ||
02 /
Coperet, Christophe 14 rue Rabelais FR-69003 Lyon / FR | |||
03 /
Veyre, Laurent 6 Voie de l'Europe FR-38200 Jardin / FR | |||
04 /
Basset, Jean-Marie 18 Chemin J.B.Gilliard 69300 Caluire et Cuire / FR | |||
05 /
Camus, Jean-Michel Les Hauts de Mourenx-Bat. B FR-64150 Mourenx / FR | |||
06 /
Maishal, Tarun 163A Cours Emile Zola FR-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | |||
07 /
Ezzeddine Karame, Iyad Ain-Zhalta Chouf / LB | |||
08 /
Boualleg, Malika 19 rue C. Michut FR-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | |||
09 /
Corriu, Robert 246 rue de l'Esperou FR-34080 Montpellier / FR | |||
10 /
Reye, Catherine Résidence le Bussy d'Amboise 160 rued'Alco FR-34080 Montpellier / FR | |||
11 /
Mehdi, Ahmad Le Patio du Plan 45 rue de l'Hortus FR-34080 Montpellier / FR | |||
12 /
Alauzun, Johan L'Ardide Haute Route de Maureilhan FR-34500 Beziers / FR | Representative(s) | Sarlin, Laure V., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès BP 7073 69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Sarlin, Laure V., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès BP 7073 69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/31] | Sarlin, Laure V., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès BP 7073 69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08290068.9 | 25.01.2008 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2082804 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2082804 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/22, B01J31/18, B01J31/02 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
B01J31/2273 (EP,US);
B01J31/0295 (EP,US);
B01J31/181 (EP,US);
B01J2231/4211 (EP,US);
B01J2531/821 (EP,US);
B01J2531/827 (EP,US);
B01J2540/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | Organisch-anorganische Hybridmaterialien mit stabilisiertem Carben | [2011/48] | English: | Hybrid organic-inorganic materials that contain stabilized carbene | [2009/31] | French: | Matériaux hybrides organiques/inorganiques contenant du carbène stabilisé | [2009/31] |
Former [2009/31] | Hybride organisch-anorganische Materialien mit stabilisiertem Carben | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2008 | AT | 03.10.2012 | BE | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | HR | 03.10.2012 | IT | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MT | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | NO | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | ES | 14.01.2013 | IE | 25.01.2013 | LU | 25.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102004039277 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-33,48-66 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0082] , [0083]; claims 12-14; compounds 2, 3 *; | [X]WO2005016524 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-33,48-66 * page 7, line 2 - line 22 * * page 11, line 18 - line 23 * * page 31, line 26 - page 36, line 5 * * page 30, line 29 - page 31, line 15 *; | [X]WO2005016941 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-33,48-66 * page 2, line 12 - line 24 * * page 33, line 16 - line 30 * | [X] - ELIAS XAVIER ET AL, "Hybrid organic-inorganic materials derived from a monosilylated Hoveyda-type ligand as recyclable diene and enyne metathesis catalysts", ADVANCED SYNTHESIS & CATALYSIS, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (20070101), vol. 349, no. 10, ISSN 1615-4150, pages 1701 - 1713, XP009102330 [X] 1-66 * schemes 2, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adsc.200600627 | [XA] - POLSHETTIWAR, VIVEK ET AL, "Silica hybrid material containing Pd-NHC complex as heterogeneous catalyst for Mizoroki-Heck reactions", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS , 48(31), 5363-5366 CODEN: TELEAY; ISSN: 0040-4039, (2007), XP022141734 [X] 1-33,48-66 * scheme 2 * * scheme 3 * [A] 34-47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2007.06.029 | [XA] - CETINKAYA B ET AL, "Synthesis and immobilization of N - heterocyclic carbene complexes of Ru(II): catalytic activity and recyclability for the furan formation", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. A, CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020101), vol. 184, ISSN 1381-1169, pages 31 - 38, XP002300268 [X] 1-33,48-66 * scheme 1, equation 1 * [A] 34-47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1381-1169(01)00527-1 | [X] - KLAPDOHR, SIMONE ET AL, "Reactions of complex ligands, Part 89. Incorporation of chromium carbenes in a silica matrix by sol - gel processing: application to aminolysis of alkoxycarbene complexes", CHEMISTRY--A EUROPEAN JOURNAL , 6(16), 3006-3017 CODEN: CEUJED; ISSN: 0947-6539, (2000), XP009102331 [X] 1-16,23 * schemes 2, 3, 4 * | by applicant | WO02076991 | - BURKETT ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (1996), page 1367 | - MACQUANIE D.J. ET AL., CHEM. COMM, (1996), page 1961 | - LNAGAKI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1999), vol. 121, page 9611 | - B. LEE ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2005), vol. 21, page 5372 | - J. MATER. CHEM., (2005), vol. 15, pages 4285 - 429 | - NEW J. CHEM., (2006), vol. 30, pages 1077 - 1082 | - J. MATER. CHEM., (2005), vol. 15, pages 803 - 809 | - X ELIAS ET AL., ADV. SYNTH. CATAL., (2007), vol. 349, page 1701 | - V. POLSHETTIWAR ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2007), vol. 48, page 5363 | - G. PARKIN, Comprehensive Organometallic Chemistry III, ELSEVIER, (2007), vol. 1 | - CORRIU R.J.P ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT; ED., (1996), vol. 35, pages 1420 - 1436 | - J. MATER, CHEM, (2005), vol. 15, page 4285 | - Comprehensive Organometallic Chemistry III, ELSEVIER, (2007), vol. 1 | - M. A. BENNETT; A. K. SMITH, J. C. S. DALTON TRANS., (1974), pages 233 - 241 | - B. L. BOOTH ET AL., J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (1986), vol. 315, pages 143 - 156 | - J MATER. CHEM., (1998), vol. 8, page 1749 | - SYNTHESIS, (2003), vol. 17, page 2661 | - J. MATER. CHEM, (2005), vol. 15, page 803 | - J. ALAUZUN ET AL., NEW J. CHEM., (2007), vol. 31, pages 911 - 915 |