blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2107707

EP2107707 - Spatial mapping of an OFDM signal to reduce attenuation from an individual transmit antenna in a mimo transmitter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.08.2018  [2018/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google Technology Holdings LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2016/21]
Former [2013/37]For all designated states
Motorola Mobility LLC
600 North US Highway 45
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
Former [2009/41]For all designated states
General instrument Corporation
101 Tournament Drive
Horsham PA 19044 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rouquette-Leveil, Stephanie
12 Rue Du Conseil De L'Europe
Massy 91300 / FR
02 / De Courville, Marc Bernard
10 Impasse Reille
Paris 75014 / FR
 [2009/41]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2009/41]Palmer, Jonathan R.
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date08290318.831.03.2008
[2009/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2107707
Date:07.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2107707
Date:23.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2008
ClassificationIPC:H04L1/06, H04B7/06, H04L1/00, H04L5/00
[2017/11]
CPC:
H04L1/0618 (EP,KR,US); H04B7/0671 (EP,KR,US); H04B7/0413 (KR);
H04L1/0071 (EP,KR,US); H04L1/0625 (EP,KR,US); H04L27/2627 (KR);
H04L5/0023 (EP,KR,US); H04L5/003 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2009/41]H04L1/06, H04B7/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2017/34]
Former [2010/24]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2009/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Räumliche Abbildung eines OFDM-Signals zur Verringerung der Abschwächung einer individuellen Übertragungsantenne in einem MIMO-Sender[2009/41]
English:Spatial mapping of an OFDM signal to reduce attenuation from an individual transmit antenna in a mimo transmitter[2009/41]
French:Cartographie spatiale d'un signal OFDM pour réduire une atténuation d'une antenne de transmission individuelle dans un transmetteur mimo[2009/41]
Examination procedure07.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/21]
08.04.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.05.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
31.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2017Fee for grant paid
10.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2010
Opposition(s)24.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
28.03.2011Request for further processing filed
28.03.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.04.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2006064469  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,8-14,16-18,20-22 * page 7 - page 9 * [Y] 7,15,19;
 [Y]  - MOHAJERANI P ET AL, "Frequency-dependent space-interleaving for MIMO OFDM systems", RADIO AND WIRELESS CONFERENCE, 2003. RAWCON '03. PROCEEDINGS AUG. 10-13, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030810), ISBN 978-0-7803-7829-2, pages 79 - 82, XP010656702 [Y] 7,15,19 * II. SYSTEM MODEL. * * fig. 1 *
 [AD]  - HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES, "Improved STBC-SM Transmission Scheme", (20070603), URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/file/07/11-07-0292-00-000n-improved-stbc-sm.doc, XP002502991 [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2006064469
    - MOHAJERANI P ET AL., "Frequency-dependent space-interleaving for MIMO OFDM systems", RADIO AND WIRELESS CONFERENCE, 2003, RAWCON '03. PROCEEDINGS AUG. 10-13, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, IEEE, 10 AUGUST 2003, (20030810), pages 79 - 82
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.