EP1978610 - Power socket with double input configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Legrand France 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states LEGRAND FRANCE 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mondary, Philippe Le Bourg 87700 Saint Priest-sous-Aixe / FR | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Orsini, Fabienne, et al Jacobacci Coralis Harle 14/16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Orsini, Fabienne, et al CORALIS 85 boulevard Malesherbes 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08290326.1 | 03.04.2008 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | FR20070002546 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: FR 0702546 | [2008/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1978610 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R29/00 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
H01R29/00 (EP);
H01R13/4532 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/25] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steckdose mit doppelter Stromversorgungskonfiguration | [2008/41] | English: | Power socket with double input configuration | [2008/41] | French: | Prise de courant à double configuration d'alimentation | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR984596 (LEBEUF) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2763431 (MARCOZ BRUNO PAUL CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3,5 * * page 1, line 5 * * page 4, line 1 - line 15 *; | [A]FR2529719 (COATAUDON JACQUES DE [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0822622 (MERTEN GMBH & CO KG GEB [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * | by applicant | FR984596 |