EP2110510 - Method for measuring return flow in a well [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/43] | Method and apparatus for measuring return flow in a well | ||
[2017/51] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MT
PT
SE
PRAD Research and Development N.V. P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | |||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MT
PT
SE
PRAD Research and Development N.V. P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vigneaux, Pierre 36 rue Grande 77950 Moisenay / FR | 02 /
Guillot, Dominique 211 Holland Street, 1 Somerville MA 02144 / US | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Vandermolen, Mathieu Intellectual Property Department Etudes & Productions Schlumberger 1, rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/43] | Rzaniak, Martin Etudes & Productions Schlumberger Intellectual Property Law Department 1, rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | Application number, filing date | 08290372.5 | 15.04.2008 | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110510 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/09, G01B9/00 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
E21B47/113 (EP,US);
E21B23/14 (EP,US);
E21B47/135 (EP,US);
G01B11/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückflussmessung in einem Bohrloch | [2017/51] | English: | Method for measuring return flow in a well | [2017/51] | French: | Procédé pour la mesure d'un écoulement de retour dans un puits | [2017/51] |
Former [2009/43] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Rückflussmessung in einem Bohrloch | ||
Former [2009/43] | Method and apparatus for measuring return flow in a well | ||
Former [2009/43] | Procédé et appareil pour la mesure d'un écoulement de retour dans un puits | Examination procedure | 30.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2119949 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]GB2349440 (SENSOR HIGHWAY LTD [GB]) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 28 - page 7, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO02059458 (NOBLE ENGINEERING AND DEV LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]GB2393465 (WEATHERFORD INTERNAT INC [US]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [X]EP1854959 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029]; figures 1,2; claims 1-16 * |