EP2117011 - Flexible electrical conductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 8, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grögl, Ferdinand Mittlere Kreuzgasse 11 90403 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Popp, Harry Praterstrasse 9 90429 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08290380.8 | 18.04.2008 | [2009/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117011 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117011 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/00, // H01B7/04 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
H01B7/0009 (EP);
H01B7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | Flexibler elektrischer Leiter | [2009/46] | English: | Flexible electrical conductor | [2009/46] | French: | Conducteur électrique flexible | [2009/46] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 13.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HR | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IE | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | LV | 29.12.2010 | MT | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | NO | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | LU | 18.04.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
LU | 18.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
LU | 18.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2098162 (REED MALCOLM W); | [A]AT373214B (OTTO HAASE GES M B H [AT], et al); | [DA]DE3305190 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE3305190 |