EP2113407 - Fluid conduit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr France Rouffach SAS 5, Avenue de la Gare 68250 Rouffach / FR | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denny, Geoffrey 8, rue Hector Berlioz 68170 Rixheim / FR | 02 /
Schmittheisler, Christophe 16 rue Schafrain 67680 Epfig / FR | 03 /
Muller, Jean-Julien 21 rue du Mühlbach 68740 Blodelsheim / FR | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Grauel, Andreas Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08290412.9 | 29.04.2008 | [2009/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113407 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60N2/56 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
B60H1/00564 (EP);
B60H1/00407 (EP);
B60H1/00521 (EP);
B60H1/2225 (EP);
B60N2/5635 (EP);
B60N2/5657 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/27] |
Former [2009/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fluidkanal | [2009/45] | English: | Fluid conduit | [2009/45] | French: | Canal de fluide | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 05.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2537170 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1-7 * pages 2,4; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0791493 (SUETRAK TRANSPORTKAELTE [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 47 - column 6, line 43; figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPS60176814 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [DA]DE10054010 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [DA] 8,9 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE102004060460 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [DA] 8,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10054010 | DE102004060460 |