EP2134057 - Method for protecting a packet-based network from attacks, as well as security border node [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/18] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wahl, Stefan Stettiner Str. 8 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
Wahl, Stefan Stettiner Str. 8 71701 Schweiberdingen / DE | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08290549.8 | 12.06.2008 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134057 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134057 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
H04L63/1416 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/22 (KR);
H04L65/1104 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schützen eines paketbasierten Netzwerks vor Attacken und Sicherheitsgrenzknoten | [2009/51] | English: | Method for protecting a packet-based network from attacks, as well as security border node | [2009/51] | French: | Procédé pour protéger des attaques un réseau par paquets, et noeud de bordure de sécurité | [2009/51] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 02.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2008 | AT | 01.05.2013 | BE | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | HR | 01.05.2013 | IT | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | MT | 01.05.2013 | NL | 01.05.2013 | PL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | IE | 12.06.2013 | LU | 12.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | NO | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007177607 (NICCOLINI SAVERIO [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0059] *; | [A] - ROSENBERG J ET AL, "The Session Initiation Protocol (SIP) and Spam", INTERNET DRAFT, XX, XX, (20050213), pages 1 - 26, XP003010228 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | - K. RIECK; P. LASKOV, "Language Models for Detection of Unknown Attacks in Network Traffic", FRAUNHOFER FIRST, URL: http://www.springerlink.com |