EP2169954 - Service configuration and management for fast channel change and reliable delivery of multimedia services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kisel, Andrey 4 In the Ray Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 8DH / GB | 02 /
Beecroft, Peter 7 Dorral Dean Highfields Caldecote Cambridgeshire CB23 7ZW / GB | 03 /
Robinson, Davie Cecil Christmas Cottage Woodsend Aldbourne Wiltshire SN8 2NP / GB | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [2010/13] | Application number, filing date | 08290900.3 | 24.09.2008 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169954 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04L12/56, H04L29/06 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (KR);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04L67/30 (EP,US);
H04N21/2221 (EP,US);
H04N21/2385 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N21/64322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Dienstkonfiguration und -verwaltung für schnellen Kanalwechsel und zur zuverlässigen Lieferung von Multimediadiensten | [2010/13] | English: | Service configuration and management for fast channel change and reliable delivery of multimedia services | [2010/13] | French: | Configuration et gestion de service pour le changement rapide de canal et la fourniture fiable de services multimédia | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2008 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007268899 (CANKAYA HAKKI CANDAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0011] - [0019] - [0092] *; | [Y]US2008046912 (GEMELOS STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0084] *; | [A]WO2008029230 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1,5,14,15* page 1, line 28 - page 3, line 14 *; | [Y]EP1959686 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0135] *; | [A]WO2008112512 (AT & T IP I LP [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,14,15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0045] *; | [Y] - HANDLEY UCL V JACOBSON PACKET DESIGN C PERKINS UNIVERSITY OF GLASGOW M, "SDP: Session Description Protocol; rfc4566.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20060701), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015055003 [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [03.1] - [5.14] * | [Y] - ESTRIN USC D FARINACCI CISCO A HELMY USC D THALER UMICH S DEERING XEROX M HANDLEY UCL V JACOBSON LBL C LIU USC P SHARMA USC L WEI, "Protocol Independent Multicast-Sparse Mode (PIM-SM): Protocol Specification; rfc2362.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (19980601), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015008146 [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [03.1] , [03.2] , [03.6] * | [Y] - FENNER B ET AL, "Multicast Source Discovery Protocol (MSDP); rfc3618.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20031001), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015009400 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - BHATTACHARYYA S ET AL, "An Overview of Source-Specific Multicast (SSM); rfc3569.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20030701), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015009351 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2008046912 | EP1959686 |