Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5415542B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2014 | B2 | JP2012503908 | 09.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08290900 | 24.09.2008 | WO2009EP06934 | 21.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010034506 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08290900 | 24.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010083326 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08290900 | 24.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110052719 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08290900 | 24.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2169954 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08290900 | 24.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101720018 | 02.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08290900 | 24.09.2008 |