blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2042497

EP2042497 - Method for producing strontium ranelate and its hydrates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  17.01.2014
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2014Opposition rejectedpublished on 19.02.2014  [2014/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Les Laboratoires Servier
12, Place de La Défense
92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
[2009/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Vaysse-Ludot, Lucile
150, route de Rançon
75490 Saint-Wandrille-Randon / FR
02 / Lecouve, Jean-Pierre
93, rue du Dr Vigné
76600 Le Havre / FR
03 / Langlois, Pascal
3, allée du Bassin
76210 Saint-Jean-de-la-Neuville / FR
 [2009/14]
Representative(s)Giudicelli, Cathy, et al
Les Laboratoires Servier
Direction Brevets
35, rue de Verdun
92284 Suresnes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/10]Giudicelli, Cathy, et al
Les Laboratoires Servier Direction Brevets 35, rue de Verdun
92284 Suresnes Cedex / FR
Former [2009/14]Giudicelli, Cathy
Les Laboratoires Servier Direction Brevets 12, Place de la Défense
92415 Courbevoie / FR
Application number, filing date08290906.025.09.2008
[2009/14]
Priority number, dateFR2007000673126.09.2007         Original published format: FR 0706731
[2009/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2042497
Date:01.04.2009
Language:FR
[2009/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2042497
Date:10.03.2010
Language:FR
[2010/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2009
ClassificationIPC:C07D333/38
[2009/14]
CPC:
C07D333/38 (EP,US); C07D333/42 (KR); A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP); A61P19/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/14]
Extension statesAL14.10.2008
BA14.10.2008
MK14.10.2008
RS14.10.2008
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Synthese von Strontiumranelat und seinen Hydraten[2009/14]
English:Method for producing strontium ranelate and its hydrates[2009/14]
French:Procédé de synthèse du ranélate de strontium et de ses hydrates[2009/14]
Examination procedure14.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/14]
07.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2010Fee for grant paid
25.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.12.2010    ADMISSIBLE
PHARMATHEN S.A.
6, Dervenakion Str.
153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR
Opponent's representative
Becker, Eberhard
Becker Kurig & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Bavariastraße 7
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/03]
Opponent(s)01  10.12.2010    ADMISSIBLE
PHARMATHEN S.A.
6, Dervenakion Str.
GR-153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR
Opponent's representative
Becker, Eberhard
Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
03.02.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.06.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
23.01.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.01.2013Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
03.12.2013Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/08]
Appeal following opposition11.02.2013Appeal received No.  T0427/13
17.05.2013Statement of grounds filed
03.12.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0415850  (ADIR [FR]) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1403266  (SERVIER LAB [FR]) [A] 1-12* page 5 - page 6; example 3; claim 3 *;
 [A]WO2007020527  (GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, lines 6,7; example 3; claim 1 *;
 CN101108845  [ ] (TIANJIN INST PHARM RESEARCH [CN]) [ ] * the whole document *;
 [E]  - HUANG, HANZHONG ET AL, "Method for preparing strontium ranelate heptahydrate", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2008:111403, URL: STN, XP002482496 [E] 1-10,12 * abstract *
by applicantEP1403266
 WO2007020527
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.