EP2070562 - Medical device for characterising the cardiac condition of a patient fitted with an active implant for biventricular stimulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ela Medical 98 Rue Maurice Arnoux 92541 Montrouge / FR | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renesto, Fabrizio Via Pozzo, 48 10013 Borgofranco d'Ivrea (TO) / IT | 02 /
Ziglio, Filippo Via ai Bolleri, 35 38040 Martignano (TN) / IT | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al SEP Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08291086.0 | 19.11.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | FR20070008681 | 13.12.2007 Original published format: FR 0708681 | [2009/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070562 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070562 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/362, // A61N1/365, A61N1/368 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/3627 (EP,US);
A61N1/36542 (EP,US);
A61N1/36843 (EP,US);
A61N1/36578 (EP,US);
A61N1/3682 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Medizinische Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des Herzzustands eines Patienten, dem ein aktives Implantat zur biventrikulären Stimulation eingesetzt wurde | [2009/25] | English: | Medical device for characterising the cardiac condition of a patient fitted with an active implant for biventricular stimulation | [2009/25] | French: | Dispositif médical pour la caractérisation de l'état cardiaque d'un patient appareillé avec un implant actif à stimulation biventriculaire | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2010 | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HR | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | LV | 29.12.2010 | MT | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | NO | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0966987 [ ] (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] *; | [A]US2005027320 (NEHLS ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] ** paragraphs [0057] - [0064] *; | [Y]EP1533001 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [Y] 9-12 * abstract * * claim 5 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0043] *; | [DXY]FR2887460 (ELA MEDICAL SOC PAR ACTIONS SI [FR]) [DX] 1-8 * abstract * * claim 1 * * pages 1-10 * [Y] 9-12; | [PX]EP1867360 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [PX] 1,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0092] * | by applicant | EP0515319 | EP0655260 | EP1108446 | EP1736203 | FR2887460 | - J. C. DAUBERT, ST/MUCOEUR, vol. 25, no. 3, pages 170 - 176 |