05.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
28.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
30.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
22.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
10.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
03.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
03.06.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
27.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
25.06.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
17.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.02.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.01.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
11.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
15.05.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |