EP2070818 - Method of supplying power to actuators associated with an aircraft landing gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, David 4 rue Auguste Perret 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Mehez, Jérôme 27 voie de Compiègne 91390 Morsang sur Orge / FR | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Parzy, Benjamin Alain, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Parzy, Benjamin Alain, et al Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08291191.8 | 15.12.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | FR20070008678 | 13.12.2007 Original published format: FR 0708678 | [2009/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070818 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070818 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B64C25/44 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
B64C25/22 (EP,US);
B64C25/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Stromversorgung von Stellantrieben, die mit dem Fahrwerk eines Flugzeugs verbunden sind | [2009/25] | English: | Method of supplying power to actuators associated with an aircraft landing gear | [2009/25] | French: | Procédé d'alimentation en énergie d'actionneurs associés à un train d'atterrissage d'aéronef | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 23.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HR | 28.07.2010 | IE | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | MT | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | PT | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | NO | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | LU | 15.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | HU | 29.01.2011 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
LU | 15.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
LU | 15.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2400587 (LIVERS CARLOS B) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 20-35; figure 1 *; | [A]US2569670 (CHARLES HOLLERITH) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]CA2479482 (LIEBHERR AEROSPACE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | CA2479482 |