EP1967705 - Valve seat for intake duct, heat engine cylinder head and manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault SAS 13-15, Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAMY, Laurence 7 rue de la Roche 92500, RUEIL MALMAISON / FR | 02 /
WILLIAM, Johann 27 rue de l'Hippodrome 92150, SURESNES / FR | [2008/37] | Application number, filing date | 08300086.9 | 12.02.2008 | [2008/37] | Priority number, date | FR20070053683 | 07.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0753683 | [2008/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967705 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01L3/06, F02F1/42 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
F01L3/06 (EP);
F02F1/4235 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/20] |
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ventilsitz für Zuführleitung, Zylinderkopf eines Verbrennungsmotors und Herstellungsverfahren | [2008/37] | English: | Valve seat for intake duct, heat engine cylinder head and manufacturing method | [2008/37] | French: | Siège de soupape pour conduit d'admission, culasse de moteur thermique, et procédé de fabrication | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2707340 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5; | [YX]EP0275841 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [Y] 3,5 * the whole document * [X] 7; | [X]FR2061434 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [X] 1,4,6 * figure 1 *; | [X]GB410047 (PAUL RUDOLPH HASSON, et al) [X] 1,2,6 * figure 4 *; | [A]AT378827B (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [ST]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3653368 (SCHERENBERG HANS O) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US1512952 (SECOR JOHN A) [A] 1,3,7 * the whole document * |