EP2105847 - Device and method for automatically generating ontologies from term definitions contained into a dictionary [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larvet, Philippe 13 rue du Jeu de Paume 91470, FORGES LES BAINS / FR | 02 /
Carrez, François 3 rue Ernest Hemingway "Green Valley" 94320, THIAIS / FR | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Lebkiri, Alexandre, et al Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25, Rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Lebkiri, Alexandre, et al Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 87 Rue Taitbout 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/51] | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude, et al 87 Rue Taitbout 75009 PARIS / FR | ||
Former [2012/29] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Intellectual Property & Standards 32 Avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2012/10] | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2009/40] | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08300157.8 | 27.03.2008 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105847 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, // G06F17/27 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
G06F16/367 (EP,KR,US);
G06F40/30 (EP,US);
G06F16/00 (KR);
G06F40/189 (KR);
G06F40/242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur automatischen Generierung von Ontologien aus Begriffsdefinitionen in einem Wörterbuch | [2009/40] | English: | Device and method for automatically generating ontologies from term definitions contained into a dictionary | [2009/40] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour générer automatiquement des ontologies à partir de définitions de mots contenues dans un dictionnaire | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 19.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.01.2019 | 30.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/27] | 23.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1903454 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0043] *; | [A]US5933822 (BRADEN-HARDER LISA [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |