EP2123978 - Process for using a facility for combusting carbonaceous materials and relating facility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maghdissian, Laurent 29, rue François Rude 94230 Cachan / FR | 02 /
Semedard, Jean-Claude 5, rue Georges Saché 75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
Piton, Antony 6, Rue des Fossés Saint-Bernard 75005 Paris / FR | 04 /
Beal, Corinne 5, Rue Van Gogh 78960 Voisins Le Bretonneux / FR | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/48] | Gauer, Pierre, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08305194.6 | 23.05.2008 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123978 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F23C10/00, C01B3/34 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
F23C10/002 (EP,US);
C01B3/344 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0255 (EP,US);
F23C2206/00 (EP,US);
F23C2900/99008 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwendung einer Einrichtung zum Verbrennen von kohlenstoffhaltigen Materialien und dazugehörige Einrichtung | [2009/48] | English: | Process for using a facility for combusting carbonaceous materials and relating facility | [2009/48] | French: | Processus d'utilisation d'une installation pour la combustion de matériaux carbonés et installation associée | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 12.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/32] | 23.03.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003035770 (COLE JERALD A [US]) [Y] 8,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003202912 (MYOHANEN KARI [FI], et al) [Y] 12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0041] - [0043] ** figure 1 *; | [XY]US2005175533 (THOMAS THEODORE J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0006] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016] , [0018] - [0025] - [0031] , [0040] - [0042] - [0051] - [0058] * * claims 1,11,19,20,32,47-49,53,59,62 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 8,11,12; | [X]WO2007082089 (UNIV OHIO STATE [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9,10 * page 1, lines 4-6 * * page 2, lines 6-19 * * page 6, lines 15-23 * * page 8, lines 14-21 * * page 9, lines 3-6 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 13 * * figures 1-6,11; claims 1,3,5,15,29 * | by applicant | FR2850156 |