Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8711024 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2014 | B2 | US2011205098 | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08305375 | 03.07.2008 | WO2009EP57734 | 22.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2321900 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08305375 | 03.07.2008 | EP09772335 | 22.06.2009 | WO2009EP57734 | 22.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010000635 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08305375 | 03.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2141802 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08305375 | 03.07.2008 |