EP2141802 - Switched capacitor amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sabut, Marc 15, Rue Paul Mistral 38320 Eybens / FR | 02 /
Gicquel, Hugo 4, Rue Irvoy 38000 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
Reaute, Fabien 45, Rue du Guichet 38140 Renage / FR | 04 /
Van Zanten, François 8, Allée de la Roseraie 38240 Meylan / FR | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2010/01] | Application number, filing date | 08305375.1 | 03.07.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141802 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
H03F3/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/36] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verstärker mit geschalteten Kondensatoren | [2010/01] | English: | Switched capacitor amplifier | [2010/01] | French: | Amplificateur de condensateur commuté | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/02] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5973536 (MAEJIMA TOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10,12-15 * abstract *; | [X]US2008094140 (LIM SEUNG-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,12-14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038]; figures 3-6A * * abstract *; | [A]US7345530 (LI JIPENG [US], et al) [A] 1-3,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - TERTULIEN NDJOUNTCHE ET AL, "Improved Structures for Programmable Filters: Application in a Switched-Capacitor Adaptive Filter Design", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS II: EXPRESS BRIEFS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990901), vol. 46, no. 9, ISSN 1057-7130, XP011013120 [A] 1-3,13 * figure 8 * | [A] - AZIZI M Y ET AL, "Thermal noise analysis of multi-bit SC gain-stages for low-voltage high-resolution pipeline ADC design", SIGNALS, CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2003. SCS 2003. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON JULY 10-11, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030710), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7979-4, pages 581 - 584, XP010655342 [A] 1-3,13 * figure 1 * |