Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2923101 | 01.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0756493 | 13.07.2007 | FR0854815 | 15.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2053735 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2019 | B1 | EP2053735 | 02.12.2015 | A3 | EP2053735 | 29.04.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR0756493 | 13.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2918818 | 16.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0756493 | 13.07.2007 |