Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8639944 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2014 | B2 | US2011131424 | 02.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08305453 | 06.08.2008 | WO2009EP59867 | 30.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011530093 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08305453 | 06.08.2008 | WO2009EP59867 | 30.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2332040 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2012 | B1 | EP2332040 | 15.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08305453 | 06.08.2008 | WO2009EP59867 | 30.07.2009 | EP09781287 | 30.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0916991 | 24.11.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08305453 | 06.08.2008 | WO2009EP59867 | 30.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010015562 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2010 | A3 | WO2010015562 | 11.02.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08305453 | 06.08.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2154604 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08305453 | 06.08.2008 |