EP2157575 - Method and apparatus for reading data from an optical storage medium, and respective optical storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knittel, Joachim Lenaustr. 32 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Arnold, Klaus-Peter Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Arnold, Klaus-Peter Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 08305494.0 | 21.08.2008 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157575 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135, G11B7/24 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
G11B7/1392 (EP);
G11B7/1353 (EP);
G11B7/1365 (EP);
G11B7/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/43] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Lesen von Daten aus einem optischen Speichermedium und zugehöriges optisches Speichermedium | [2010/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for reading data from an optical storage medium, and respective optical storage medium | [2010/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil de lecture de données sur un support de stockage optique et support de stockage optique correspondant | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]US5625613 (KATO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-4,8-10,13 * column 2, line 18 - column 5, line 8 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 54; figures 1,2,8,10 * [A] 5-7,11,12; | [X]US2005213479 (TAKAMORI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 13-15 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] *; | [A]EP1566668 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | US6115345 | US5625613 | JPH07320295 | JPH07234382 |