EP2166807 - Method for building sets of mobile stations in SDMA systems, corresponding mobile station, base stations and radio communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/12] | Method for building sets of mobile stations in SDMA systems, corresponding mobile station, base stations, operation and maintenance centre and radio communication network | ||
[2010/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wild, Thorsten Franklinstrasse 37 70435, Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Hoek, Cornelis Tuebingerstr.108 71732, Tamm / DE | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Brose, Gerhard Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Brose, Gerhard Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08305573.1 | 19.09.2008 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2166807 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2166807 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/08 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
H04B7/0621 (EP);
H04W72/542 (EP);
H04B17/26 (EP);
H04B7/0491 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04B7/0632 (EP);
H04B7/0634 (EP);
H04B7/066 (EP);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04W16/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/48] |
Former [2010/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Satzbildung von mobilen Stationen in SDMA-Systemen, entsprechende Mobilstation, Basisstationen und Funkkommunikationsnetzwerk | [2010/23] | English: | Method for building sets of mobile stations in SDMA systems, corresponding mobile station, base stations and radio communication network | [2010/23] | French: | Procédé pour la construction d'ensembles de stations mobiles dans des systèmes SDMA, station mobile correspondante, stations de base et réseau de communication radio | [2010/23] |
Former [2010/12] | Verfahren zur Satzbildung von mobilen Stationen in SDMA-Systemen, entsprechende Mobilstation, Basisstationen, Betrieb und Wartungszentrum und Funkkommunikationsnetzwerk | ||
Former [2010/12] | Method for building sets of mobile stations in SDMA systems, corresponding mobile station, base stations, operation and maintenance centre and radio communication network | ||
Former [2010/12] | Procédé pour la construction d'ensembles de stations mobiles dans des systèmes SDMA, station mobile correspondante, stations de base, centre d'opération et de maintenance et réseau de communication radio | Examination procedure | 28.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 25.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9830047 (ARRAYCOMM INC [US], et al); | [AD]EP1784032 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]); | [A]US2007249402 (DONG MIN [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1784032 |