EP2184904 - Method for automatically installing and configuring application and services on devices which comprise lifecycle management functionalities and corresponding client premises equipments, auto configuration server and module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2017/37] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Justen, Pascal Nijvelsedreef 172/21 1150, Brussel / BE | 02 /
Acke, Willem Hoogstraat 30 2820, Rijmenam / BE | 03 /
Stevens, Christoph Brugstraat 23 9190, Stekene / BE | 04 /
Liekens, Werner Abeel 10 2580, Sint-Katelijne-Waver / BE | 05 /
Vermoesen, Luc Barelveldweg 148 2880, Bornem / BE | 06 /
Van Leeuwen, Tom Haagstuk 31 9032 Wondelgem / BE | 07 /
De Loof, Jourik Populierenlaan 46 2630, Aartselaar / BE | [2017/36] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
Justen, Pascal Nijvelsedreef 172/21 1150, Brussel / BE | ||
02 /
Acke, Willem Hoogstraat 30 2820, Rijmenam / BE | |||
03 /
Stevens, Christoph Brugstraat 23 9190, Stekene / BE | |||
04 /
Liekens, Werner Abeel 10 2580, Sint-Katelijne-Waver / BE | |||
05 /
Vermoesen, Luc Barelveldweg 148 2880, Bornem / BE | |||
06 /
Van Leeuwen, Tom H. Frere Orbanlaan 681 9000, Gent / BE | |||
07 /
De Loof, Jourik Populierenlaan 46 2630, Aartselaar / BE | Representative(s) | Nokia Bell Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/37] | ALU Antw Patent Attorneys Intellectual Property and Standards Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | ||
Former [2010/19] | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 08305781.0 | 06.11.2008 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184904 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2184904 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L29/08 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
H04L41/5054 (EP);
H04L41/5096 (EP);
H04L67/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/19] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2010/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Installations- und Konfigurationsanwendung und Dienste und Vorrichtungen mit Lebenszyklusverwaltungsfunktionen und entsprechende Geräte auf dem Kundengelände, Konfigurationsserver und Modul | [2010/19] | English: | Method for automatically installing and configuring application and services on devices which comprise lifecycle management functionalities and corresponding client premises equipments, auto configuration server and module | [2010/19] | French: | Procédé pour l'installation automatique et la configuration d'une application et de services sur des dispositifs qui comprend des fonctionnalités de gestion du cycle de vie et des équipements correspondants sur le site du client, serveur et module d'auto-configuration | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2008 | AT | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | ES | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | IT | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | IE | 06.11.2017 | LU | 06.11.2017 | MT | 06.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | FR | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | GB | 13.12.2017 | NO | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | DE | 02.06.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 06.11.2008 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.11.2008 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.11.2008 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | |
NO | 13.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1835690 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0023] *; | [Y]WO2008032922 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0024] *; | [A]US2005210474 (HAYES KENT F JR [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] *; | [A]US2003191823 (BANSAL RAJNISH KUMAR [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0046] * |