EP2071503 - Immersion into a virtual environment through a solicitation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cahuzac, Maud France Telecom Etats Unis 240 Dolores Street 336 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 02 /
Narayanan, Rajesh France Telecom Etats Unis 702 Broadmoor Drive San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2009/25] | Application number, filing date | 08305923.8 | 11.12.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | US20070956355 | 14.12.2007 Original published format: US 956355 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2071503 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Eintauchen in eine virtuelle Umgebung mittels einer Anfrage | [2009/25] | English: | Immersion into a virtual environment through a solicitation | [2009/25] | French: | Immersion dans un environnement virtuel via une sollicitation | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - "STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-14 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods(OJ 11/2007; p592-593) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | Examination | EP1026607 | WO02097616 | US2005216346 |