EP2030916 - Handling appliance having chains with flexible links and bars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PELLENC (Société Anonyme) Route de Cavaillon, Quartier Notre Dame 84120 Pertuis / FR | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pellenc, Roger 110, chemin de l'Abbaye 84120 Pertuis / FR | 02 /
Gialis, Jean-Marc 271, chemin de Cassouillet 84460 Cheval Blanc / FR | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Marek, Pierre 28, rue de la Loge B.P. 42413 13215 Marseille Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Marek, Pierre 28, rue de la Loge B.P. 42413 13215 Marseille Cedex 02 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08358007.6 | 22.08.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | FR20070006082 | 30.08.2007 Original published format: FR 0706082 | [2009/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2030916 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030916 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/06 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
B65G17/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2009/46] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wartungsvorrichtung für Ketten mit flexiblen Kettengliedern und Gittern | [2009/10] | English: | Handling appliance having chains with flexible links and bars | [2009/10] | French: | Dispositif de manutention à chaînes à maillons flexibles et barreaux | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 29.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2795599 (PELLENC SA [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2134763 (NAT RES DEV) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2795599 |