EP2078981 - Lens positioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2015 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | 26.05.2015 | Deletion: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digital Imaging Systems GmbH Neuer Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | [2011/52] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Dialog Imaging Systems GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horst Knoedgen Hitlestrasse 64 80997 Munich Germany / DE | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Patronus IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neumarkter Strasse 18 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Patronus IP Trudenringer Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/52] | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | Application number, filing date | 08368001.7 | 10.01.2008 | [2009/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078981 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03B3/02 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
G03B3/02 (EP,US);
G02B7/023 (EP,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H04N23/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | Linsenpositionierungssystem | [2009/29] | English: | Lens positioning system | [2009/29] | French: | Système de positionnement de lentille | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/09] | 03.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.04.2015 | 14.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2010 | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 03.05.2011 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS62220938 (CHINON IND INC) [X] 1,32 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,3,6-10,33-36; | [A]EP0586023 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 4 * page 5, line 12 - line 20 *; | [Y]EP0757269 (SCANTECH BV [NL]) [Y] 2,3 * claim 3 *; | [A]US2002135384 (STRACK PETER [FR], et al) [A] 4,5* figure 4 *; | [DY]US2003012568 (ISHIKAWA MASANORI [JP], et al) [DY] 34 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2003185406 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [Y] 33 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2007199253 (SHICOH ENG CO LTD) [Y] 36 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2007316569 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC) [Y] 35 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2007141225 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [Y] 6,7 * page 8, line 19 - line 32 *; | [Y] - WONGKOMET, BOSER, "Correlated double sampling in capacitive position sensing circuits for micromachined applications", CIRCUIT AND SYSTEMS, 1998, IEEE APCCAS, Chiangmai, Thailand, (19981124), pages 723 - 726, XP002486341 [Y] 8-10 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS62220938 | EP0586023 | EP0757269 | US5623708 | US2002135384 | US2003012568 | JP2003185406 | JP2007199253 | JP2007316569 | WO2007141225 |